judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-96-00105-CR
06-96-00105-CR
11/14/1996
Robbery
Blake, Diane R.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/1997Mandate Issued
04/22/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/22/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/08/1997Submitted
04/08/1997Submission
03/18/1997Submission
02/12/1997Brief Filed
02/12/1997Case ready to be set
01/23/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/14/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/30/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/20/1996Holding for Record
12/20/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/20/1996Brief Filed
12/20/1996Request for Oral Argument
11/26/1996No Description Available.
11/20/1996Transcript Filed
11/14/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Diane R. BlakeAppellantTroy A. Hornsby
Trial Court Information
102nd District Court
Bowie
95F-715-102
75 yrs TDCJ