judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00357-CV
09-96-00357-CV
11/14/1996
Appeal from a summary judgment
The State of Texas
Azios, Cindy
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/07/1998Mandate Issued
07/07/1998MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
04/23/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/12/1998Submitted
03/12/1998Submission
12/16/1997Submission
02/14/1997Brief Filed
02/14/1997Case ready to be set
01/21/1997Brief Filed
12/23/1996Transcript Filed
11/22/1996Letter
11/14/1996Response
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/07/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasAppellantHector J. Flores
Azios, CindyAppelleeKenna M. Seiler
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
96-01-00294 CV