judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1124-89
PD-1124-89
08/10/1989
PDR Case Type
WILLIS, JAMES LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/10/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
WILLIS, JAMES LEEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Allan Fishburn
Court of Appeals Information:
08-89-00118-CR
rev & rem 6-21-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 4 of Dallas County
Dallas
F88-92788-JK