judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00377-CV
04-89-00377-CV
08/09/1989
Other Personal Injury
Welex, A Division of Halliburton Company
Jerry Wayne Broom
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/21/1996Original Exhibits Returned
07/17/1992Mandate Issued
07/17/1992Mandate Issued
07/10/1992Case Returned from Higher Court
07/01/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/03/1992Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
04/02/1992Information regarding cause received
03/27/1992Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/24/1992Writ of Error filed
03/24/1992Writ of Error filed
03/24/1992Writ of Error filed
02/21/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/03/1992Response to Motion Filed
01/24/1992Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/24/1992Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/08/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/08/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/13/1991Motion f/l/file Amended Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/1991Motion f/l/file Amended Brief Filed
12/09/1991Submitted
12/09/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
12/09/1991Case remanded from higher court
12/09/1991Submission
12/09/1991Submitted
11/27/1991Amended Brief Filed
11/27/1991Amended Brief Received
11/22/1991Mandate Issued
10/16/1991Higher Court DecisionReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
10/16/1991Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/21/1991Writ of Error filed
04/08/1991Information regarding cause received
04/08/1991Information regarding cause received
03/28/1991Information regarding cause received
03/22/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/31/1991Motion Filed
01/31/1991Motion Filed
01/31/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/16/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/16/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/16/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1990Motion f/lfile Amicus Curiae DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
08/30/1990Motion f/lfile Amicus Curiae DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
08/30/1990Motion f/lfile Amicus Curiae DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
08/30/1990Motion f/lfile Amicus Curiae DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
08/22/1990Amicus Curiae Brief Received
08/22/1990Motion f/lfile Amicus Curiae Brief Filed
08/22/1990Amicus Curiae Brief Received
08/22/1990Motion f/lfile Amicus Curiae Brief Filed
06/12/1990Submitted
06/12/1990Submission
06/12/1990Submitted
06/05/1990Reply brief filed
05/10/1990Submission
04/30/1990Case ready to be set
04/30/1990Requests Oral Argument
04/30/1990Brief Filed
04/30/1990Case ready to be set
04/12/1990Information regarding cause received
03/26/1990Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/21/1990Motion f/l/file Amended Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1990Motion f/l/file Amended Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1990Motion Filed
03/21/1990Motion f/l/file Amended Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1990Exhibits Filed
03/14/1990Exhibits received
03/14/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/14/1990Motion for Leave Filed
03/14/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/05/1990Amended Brief Filed
03/05/1990Motion f/l/file Amended Brief Filed
03/05/1990Amended Brief Received
03/02/1990Brief Filed
03/02/1990No Description Available.
03/02/1990Requests Oral Argument
03/02/1990No Description Available.
03/02/1990No Description Available.
01/31/1990Exhibits Filed
01/31/1990No Description Available.
12/01/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/01/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/01/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1989No Description Available.
10/24/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
10/24/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
10/24/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
10/12/1989No Description Available.
08/21/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
08/16/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989No Description Available.
08/10/1989Information regarding cause received
08/09/1989No Description Available.
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/20/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/18/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/17/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Welex, A Division Of HalliburtAppellantMarie R. Yeates
R. Glen Rigby
M. W. Meredith, Jr.
Eva C. Ramos
Linda K. McCloud
Harry M. Reasoner
Penelope E. Nicholson
W. James Kronzer
Jerry Wayne BroomAppelleeRussell H. McMains
Arnulfo Gonzalez, Jr.
Kimberley Hall Seger
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Zapata
Honorable Manuel R. Flores
2,224
n/a