judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00198-CV
09-89-00198-CV
08/10/1989
Contract
Baldwin, D.D.
American Bank
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/1990Mandate Issued
12/06/1989Order EnteredDismissed
11/30/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/27/1989Letter
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/27/1989Brief received, not filed
09/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/16/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedCarried with the case
08/15/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/10/1989Transcript Filed
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D.d. BaldwinAppellant
American BankAppellee
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
89-07-3624A