judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00236-CV
11-89-00236-CV
08/10/1989
Divorce
In Re: C.M.M., a child
-
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/03/1990Mandate issued
11/15/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedOverruled
10/25/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
10/04/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
09/06/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
07/26/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/1990Mot. - Ext. time to file MRH
06/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/29/1990Submitted
03/29/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/28/1990Letter filed from . . .
12/28/1989Letter filed from . . .
12/26/1989Brief filed
12/26/1989Case ready to be set
12/07/1989Brief filed
12/07/1989Mot. - To file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
11/29/1989Brief received
11/09/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1989Mot. - Ext. to file brief
09/28/1989SF filed
09/28/1989Mot. - To file disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article
09/21/1989Motion filing fee paid
09/18/1989SF received
08/31/1989Mot. - Ext. time to file SF disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/21/1989Motion filing fee paid
08/17/1989Motion fee requested
08/17/1989Mot. - Ext. time to file SF
08/16/1989Filing fee paid
08/10/1989Filing fee not paid - possible dismissal
08/10/1989TR filed
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C.m.m., A ChildCivil - Ad LitemChristopher Carnohan
Pro SeAppellantAllen & Patty Muth
Department Of Human ServicesAppelleeJames Hicks, District Attorney
Muth, AllenAppellantDavid W. Thedford
Trial Court Information
326th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Aleta D. Hacker, Judge
683-CX