judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00749-CR
14-89-00749-CR
08/11/1989
Other Felony
Scuderi, Michael Steven
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989Case stored
10/17/1989Mandate Issued
10/17/1989Mandate Issued
10/02/1989No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/15/1989No motion for rehearing FILED
08/31/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/31/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/30/1989Submitted
08/30/1989Submission
08/30/1989Submitted
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/20/1989Motion for new trial FILEDGRANTED
05/26/1989Date of Sentence
05/26/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/20/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Guarino
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWilliam M. Hicks
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
Honorable ROY CHARLES ENGELKE
88CR1142
10 yrs. TDC