judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00311-CV
13-89-00311-CV
08/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Corro, Gustavo J., d/b/a Granada Inn
Southwestern Bell Media, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/1990Mandate Issued
01/03/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
12/14/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedDismissed
12/14/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedDismissed
12/14/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
12/14/1989Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
11/17/1989Letter sent
09/01/1989Response to _____________.
09/01/1989Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
08/29/1989Miscellaneous Motion
08/29/1989Response to _____________.
08/28/1989Miscellaneous Motion
08/28/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/23/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/23/1989Statement of Facts Received
08/23/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/22/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/18/1989Green card in
08/16/198910 day letter sent
08/11/1989Transcript Received
08/11/1989Address Change
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/08/1989Due date for record to be filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwestern Bell Media, Inc.AppelleeH. Harman Camp
CorroAppellantNolan K. Stutzman
Trial Court Information
92nd District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Homer Salinas
C-3259-88-A