judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00208-CR
02-89-00208-CR
08/09/1989
Theft
Wafers, Joe Dan
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/31/1990Motion to Abate AppealMotion or Writ Granted
07/31/1990Mandate Issued
07/31/1990Opinion issuedAbated
07/25/1990Motion to Abate Appeal
04/23/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/18/1990Letter Brief Filed
04/02/1990Brief Filed
03/14/1990Brief Filed
03/14/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1990Motion Filed
03/08/1990Submission
03/08/1990Brief Filed
02/05/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/12/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/08/1989No Description Available.
09/11/1989No Description Available.
09/08/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/07/1989No Description Available.
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
CCC4-0360822
$500.Fine,$149.CC,180daJai