judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH DWIGHT BALDWIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1452
Short Caption:KENNETH DWIGHT BALDWIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2116-10Filed Date:11/17/2010

Opening Event Date:11/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth Dwight Baldwin Y
Ruth ZanoniYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mona A. Sahaf NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ruth Zanoni, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ruth Zanoni, Esquire
01/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (7pgs/Tape) 11/15/10 proc. (morning)
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (84pgs/Kaczorowski) 11/15/10 proc. (afternoon) w/CD
01/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/24/2011RECORD INDEX
01/24/2011RECORD COPIES
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 2, 2011 (unopposed)
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
05/03/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief and appendix
05/13/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
06/13/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/14/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
10/20/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/20/2011FiledAffirmed
11/15/2011FiledMandate