judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00379-CV
04-89-00379-CV
08/09/1989
Contract
Edmundo O. Garcia, M.D.
Federal Deposit Insurance Corp., As Receiver of Summit Bank
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/18/1990Mandate Issued
07/18/1990Mandate Issued
05/30/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/30/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/30/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/30/1990Motion Filed
02/28/1990Motion to Withdraw DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/1990Verification Filed
02/16/1990Motion to Withdraw Filed
09/26/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/1989Motion Filed
09/22/1989Motion Filed
09/11/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/07/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/28/1989Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
08/15/1989Motion for Leave Filed
08/15/1989Requests Oral Argument
08/15/1989Brief Filed
08/09/1989No Description Available.
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/13/1989Appeal Bond Filed
01/17/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
224th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carolyn Spears Petersen
88-CI-20991
n/a