judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMPBELL (URICOS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38268
Short Caption:CAMPBELL (URICOS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 30486 , 44942 , 69725 , 69725-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135948Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13145
08/08/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 01-13434
08/16/2001MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Order Appointing Fast Track Appellate Counsel and for Clarification of Rule 3C, N.R.A.P. 01-13974
09/10/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-15235
09/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/31/01 and 07/31/01. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. Filed in district court on: September 5, 2001. 01-15237
09/12/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/31/01. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 01-15422
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 10, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to file the rough draft transcript request forms late. The request forms were filed in the district court on September 5, 2001, and in this court on September 10, 2001. The motion is therefore denied as moot. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-16004
09/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 16, 2001, appellant's counsel Gary E. Gowen filed a motion for an order appointing fast track appellate counsel. Mr. Gowen informs this court that he filed a notice of withdrawal of counsel in the district court on July 18, 2001. This notice is without effect. To the extent that Mr. Gowen's motion is a motion to withdraw as counsel in this appeal, the motion is denied. Counsel may not withdraw until he has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b). Specifically, counsel must first file a fast track statement. On September 21, 2001, this court ordered Mr. Gowenn to file the fast track statement on or before October 11, 2001. That deadline remains in effect. Mr. Gowen also requests that this court issue an order clarifying NRAP 3C. Any concerns that Mr. Gowen has in this regard should be addressed to the district court. 01-16312
11/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Mr. Gowen shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why Mr. Gowen should not be sanctioned. 01-19129
01/08/2002Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Mr. Gowen has failed to respond to this court's order of November 15, 2001. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Mr. Gowen shall personally pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made to the Supreme Court law Library within 20 days of this order. Further, Mr. Gowen shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order or show cause why Mr. Gowen should not be sanctioned further. 02-00426
02/01/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to withdraw sanctions (last sentence requests an extension of time for the filing of the fast track statement). 02-02183
06/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On February 1, 2002, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw sanctions that had been previously imposed in this appeal. The last sentence of the motion also requested an extension of time to file the fast track statement. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 02-10383
07/22/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-12508
08/05/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Third Motion for Enlargement of Time. 02-13334
08/05/2002MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Statement of 22 Pages. 02-13335
08/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the 23-page fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on August 5, 2002. 02-13780
08/12/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 02-13336
08/12/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 through 7. 02-13337
09/05/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: September 10, 2002. 02-15278
09/12/2002MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 02-15885
09/19/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 12, 2002. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response and appendix provisionally submitted on September 12, 2002. 02-16347
09/19/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-15886
09/19/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 02-15887
12/04/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn23[Although this court has elected to file the appendix submitted by appellant, we note that it does not comply with the arrangement and form requirements of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Failure to comply with the requirements for appendices in the future may result in the appendix being returned, unfiled, to be correctly prepared and may also result in the imposition of sanctions by this court.] NNP03Y-CY/RR/DA 02-20719
12/31/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-21222
12/31/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2003. 02-21222
03/18/2003Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Order Vacating Sanctions. Attorney Gary E. Gowen has moved this court to vacate sanctions in the amount of $500 that this court imposed on January 8, 2002. We grant the motion. The sanctions previously imposed are hereby vacated. In the future this court expects Mr. Gowen to notify this court promptly and move to withdraw as counsel of record when personal difficulties interfere with his ability to fulfill his appellate obligations to this court and his clients. fn1[Counsel correctly represents that this court previously denied his request to appoint new fast track counsel. The request for new counsel that Mr. Gowen previously submitted to this court did not specify the personal difficulties that he now cites in support of his motion to vacate the sanctions.] 03-04533
03/26/2003Other Other. Received returned certified mail addressed to Gary Gowen containing copy of order filed on 03/18/03. Remailed by certified mail to corrected address. Nos. 38268/38269/40073/40340/40341/40343.