judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JAMES W. BARLOW, AN EMPLOYEE OF GREY WOLF DRILLING, INC.: JAMES W. BARLOW v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0243)
Case Number:S-10-0243Case Docketed On:11/10/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JAMES W. BARLOW, AN EMPLOYEE OF GREY WOLF DRILLING, INC.: JAMES W. BARLOW v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JAMES W. BARLOW, AN EMPLOYEE OF GREY WOLF DRILLING, INC.: JAMES W. BARLOW, Appellant (Employee/Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Objector/Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames W. BarlowLarry B. Jones
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 120
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/10/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/10/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/27/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costsBriefAppellantFinal
12/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant James W. Barlow and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/08/2011Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellee, wrong brief uploadedEventPhone CallFinal
02/08/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/15/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/01/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/09/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/09/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/13/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/12/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal