judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANLEY EASTON-EL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1451
Short Caption:STANLEY EASTON-EL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2010-10Filed Date:11/10/2010

Opening Event Date:11/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStanley Easton-El YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William Farley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Farley, Esquire
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5pgs/Tape) 9/1/10 proc.
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD -#2 (5pgs/Tape) 9/28/10 proc.
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (69pgs/Tape) 11/3/10 proc.
01/05/2011error
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (13pgs/Tape) 11/9/10 proc. w/CD
01/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/24/2011RECORD INDEX
01/24/2011RECORD COPIES
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 7, 2011 (no oppo)
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 7, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/06/2011APPENDIX
05/06/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/10/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to extend time to file oppo - motion to file (LODGED) oppo
05/13/2011APPELLANT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to aple's motion for summary affirmance (no oppo)
06/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION to file aplt's opposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance (no oppo)
06/15/2011RECEIVED - aplt's opposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance
07/01/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION and the Clerk shall file the LODGED OPPOSITION. It is ***MORE***
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION
07/01/2011 JMT GRANT APPELLEE MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE ...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE****
07/01/2011AFFIRMED (GLRDTE)
07/14/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)