judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00185-CV
02-89-00185-CV
08/10/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Moore, Carol
Texas Dept. of Highways & Public Transporation, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/13/1990Mandate Issued
06/27/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/16/1990Submitted
01/16/1990Submission
01/15/1990Order Entered
11/17/1989No Description Available.
11/01/1989Motion Filed
11/01/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Brief Filed
10/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/26/1989No Description Available.
09/26/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Motion Filed
09/11/1989Brief Filed
08/10/1989Submission
08/10/1989No Description Available.
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
271st District Court
Wise
Honorable John R. Lindsey
87-09-461