judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00186-CV
02-89-00186-CV
08/10/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Hall, Rocksey Rae
Hunter, Francis Elaine
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
04/11/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Submitted
02/13/1990Submission
02/07/1990Order Entered
10/24/1989Brief Filed
09/29/1989Brief Filed
09/01/1989Submission
08/30/1989No Description Available.
08/30/1989No Description Available.
08/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/11/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/10/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/29/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
141st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Dixon W. Holman
110705-88