judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00748-CV
14-89-00748-CV
08/10/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Carbomedics, Inc.
Caldwell, Neil, Judge, 23rd District Court of Brazoria
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/29/1990Case stored
11/09/1989Opinion issuedGRANTED
11/09/1989Opinion issuedGRANTED
10/11/1989Submitted
10/11/1989Submission
10/11/1989Submitted
09/11/1989Submission
09/07/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESGRANTED
09/07/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESGRANTED
09/07/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
08/25/1989Reply Brief Filed
08/21/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
08/15/1989Court's request for a response
08/10/1989Exhibits received
08/10/1989Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
08/10/1989Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorJoseph Patterson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorHon. James W. Repass
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorHon. Larry C. Jones
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentMichael M. Phillips
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
89C0204