judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00956-CR
05-89-00956-CR
08/10/1989
All Misdemeanors
Harrington, Fred Joseph
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
03/05/1991Mandate Issued
03/05/1991Mandate Issued
02/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/14/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
10/17/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/17/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/17/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
03/05/1990Brief Filed
03/05/1990Case ready to be set
03/05/1990Case ready to be set
02/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/12/1989Brief Filed
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/21/1989Transcript Filed
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/25/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Ben F. Ellis
MB87-53440-A
$1,000 Fine 90da/Prob24Mos