judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00823-CR
01-89-00823-CR
08/10/1989
Robbery
Brackins, Jimmy Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/06/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/08/1991Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
05/08/1991Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
04/18/1991Motion to publish opinion or order of courtMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
03/05/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
03/01/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
02/21/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/11/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/06/1991Motion to publish opinion or order of court
01/25/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
01/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/21/1990Submitted
11/21/1990Submission
11/21/1990Submitted
10/05/1990Submission
07/03/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/03/1990Case ready to be set
07/03/1990Case ready to be set
06/14/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
06/14/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/04/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/23/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/30/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/01/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
03/01/1990Statement of facts filed
02/14/1990Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
01/18/1990Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
01/18/1990Transcript filed
01/04/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
01/04/1990Motion to extend time to file transcript
12/19/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/05/1989Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/07/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantRosemary Garza
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - State of TexasJames R. Buchanan
StateCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
519,308
50 yrs tdc