judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8949
C-8949
08/10/1989
WRIT ERROR - CAUSE
CHARLES EVANS ET AL.
THOMAS R. POLLOCK ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/20/1989Reply BriefRespondentON BEHALF OF JOAN HORNSBY
10/09/1989Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerPET'S SUPPLEMENTAL RELY BRIEF
09/08/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF J. HORNSBY, J. E. MAY, S. M. MAY, B. HORNSBY, T. JOHNSON, S. H. JOHNSON
08/10/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/07/1990Dissenting opinion issued.by Justice Gonzalez.
08/20/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
08/20/1990Mandate issuedNo Rehearing filed Remanded to the Third Court of Appeals
07/09/1990Letter FiledFROM ATTY WATSON REQUESTING REMOVAL FROM THE LIST OF ATTYS, ATTYS SELBY & FULLER HAVE BEEN SUBSTITUTED.
06/29/1990Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling granted
06/28/1990Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing
06/14/1990Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See RemarksCORRECTED P.1 OF OPINION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES OF RECORD
06/13/1990Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record
06/13/1990Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsOP/J.RAY (J.DOGGETT NOT SITTING); J. GONZALEZ NOTES DISSENT. (Diss. Op. del. 1/7/90).
06/13/1990Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsOP/J.RAY (J.DOGGETT NOT SITTING); J. GONZALEZ NOTES DISSENT. (Diss. Op. del. 1/7/90).
06/13/1990Order of the Court IssuedCourt of Appeals Opinion ordered publishedTO 3RD CA TO PUBLISH THEIR OPINION
01/03/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
01/03/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
01/03/1990Oral argument ARGUED FOR PET BY JIM ARNOLD AND MARK L. PEARLMUTTER ARGUED FOR RESP BY ELIZABETH BLOCH
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
10/25/1989Amount of time allotted for oral argument.25/25-10 MINUTES.
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedON PTS. 1, 2 & 3. (J.DOGGETT N/S)
10/25/1989Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
10/20/1989Reply BriefON BEHALF OF JOAN HORNSBY
10/09/1989Supplemental Brief filedPET'S SUPPLEMENTAL RELY BRIEF
09/21/1989Petitioner's reply briefREPLY TO HORNSBY'S REPLY TO APP
09/14/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/14/1989No description available.
09/08/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF J. HORNSBY, J. E. MAY, S. M. MAY, B. HORNSBY, T. JOHNSON, S. H. JOHNSON
08/30/1989Letter FiledRE: PETITIONERS WILL NOT MIND IF THE M/E/T IS GRANTED (SEE EVENT #3)
08/29/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling granted
08/10/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/20/1990Case StoredCase stored.no rehearing filed; remanded to the Third Court of Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EVANS, MARYPetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
HORNSBY, BARTHOLOMEW ANDREWRespondentMr. Steve Selby
MAY, SARAH MEGANRespondentMr. Steve Selby
JOHNSTON, STANLEY DUNSTANRespondentMr. Steve Selby
MAY, JAMES EDWINRespondentMr. Steve Selby
SOUSARES, KATHRYNPetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
YOAS, JESSIEPetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
FOX, LINDYPetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
HORNSBY, JOANRespondentMr. Steve Selby
YOAS, HOWARDPetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
FOX, RANDYPetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
ARNOLD, SR., JIMPetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
ARNOLD, JESSAMINE J.PetitionerMr. Jim Arnold Jr.
JOHNSTON, THOMAS HAMPTONRespondentMr. Steve Selby
Court of Appeals Information:
03-86-00068-CV
Reversed and Rendered
793 SW2d 14, 03-15-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable MARILYN ABOUSSIE
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
376,575