judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00751-CR
14-89-00751-CR
08/11/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Alford, Paul Stephen
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/1991Case stored
12/04/1990Mandate Issued
12/04/1990Mandate Issued
11/19/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/02/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
10/18/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/18/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
08/21/1990Submission
04/24/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/24/1990Case ready to be set
04/24/1990Case ready to be set
04/12/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/06/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/09/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/02/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/05/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/07/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/29/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/31/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/19/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/12/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/09/1989Transcript FILED
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/08/1989Date of Sentence
08/08/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantFloyd W. Freed, III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCarol M. Cameron
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable JAMES BRIAN RAINS
499,302
8 years TDC/$10,000 fine