judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00309-CV
13-89-00309-CV
08/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Dewbre, Jerry C., Joseph P. Mueller, J. Paul Mueller, Jr., et al.
Cann, Edwin and Thomas Cann
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1991Mandate Issued
01/30/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/23/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/05/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
10/30/1990Supreme Court Number
10/18/1990Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
10/01/1990Filing Fee Paid
10/01/1990Writ Filed
08/31/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/20/1990Response to _____________.
08/09/1990Reply Brief Filed
07/16/1990Motion for rehearing filed
07/16/1990Brief in support of
06/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/18/1990Submitted
01/18/1990Submission
01/16/1990Reply Brief Filed
01/10/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
12/20/1989Submission
12/20/1989Pages filed
12/14/1989Oral argument requested
12/14/1989Brief Filed
11/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/16/1989Response to _____________.
11/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/09/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Oral argument requested
10/23/1989Brief Filed
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Appellant's Brief Received
10/19/1989Sworn Statement filed
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/14/1989Additional copies of motion for extension of time
09/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/16/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/14/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/14/1989Statement of Facts Received
08/14/1989Exhibits received
08/14/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/14/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/14/1989Exhibits Filed
08/11/1989Transcript Filed
08/11/1989Transcript Received
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/20/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/07/1989Copy of Order from trial court.
07/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
267th District Court
Goliad
Honorable Marion M Lewis
87-9-6355