judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00381-CR
04-89-00381-CR
08/10/1989
All Misdemeanors
Fasci, Humberto
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/10/1990Mandate Issued
12/10/1990Mandate Issued
10/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
05/02/1990Submitted
04/06/1990Submission
03/01/1990Brief Filed
03/01/1990Case ready to be set
03/01/1990Case ready to be set
02/16/1990Motion DisposedFiling is Moot
02/07/1990Motion Filed
02/07/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
02/02/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/22/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/29/1989Brief Filed
11/30/1989No Description Available.
10/30/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/27/1989No Description Available.
10/02/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/28/1989No Description Available.
09/06/1989No Description Available.Abeyance
09/05/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/01/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/18/1989No Description Available.
08/11/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/10/1989Mot. EOT to file NOA Filed
08/10/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/06/1989Motion for New Trial Filed
05/08/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/10/1990Case StoredCase stored
12/10/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Webb
Honorable Raul Vasquez
K-89-344-C2
30 days jail and $4000