judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5888
B-5888
03/22/1976
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF KENNEDALE, TEXAS
CITY OF ARLINGTON, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/04/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/05/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/20/1976Document received (See Remarks)
10/20/1976Document received (See Remarks)
10/20/1976Document received (See Remarks)
10/20/1976Document received (See Remarks)
10/20/1976Document received (See Remarks)
10/13/1976Motion to dismissFiling granted
06/04/1976Motion for RehearingFiling granted
04/05/1976Response to Petition
03/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/22/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Kennedale, TexasPetitioner
City of Arlington, TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information