judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5883
B-5883
03/17/1976
Application for Writ of Error
COLONIAL SAVINGS ASSOCIATION
WAYMON JOEL TAYLOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/10/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/03/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/31/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
03/17/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/24/1977Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
12/16/1976Response to Motion filed
12/10/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/24/1976Opinion issued
07/03/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/28/1976Document received (See Remarks)
04/28/1976Document received (See Remarks)
03/31/1976Response to Petition
03/17/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/17/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Colonial Savings AssociationPetitioner
Texas Mortgage Bankers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Waymon Joel TaylorRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information