Case Information: 38284 | |||
Short Caption: | ZEGERMAN (CATHERINE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFO007665 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/08/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/08/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-13424 | |
08/17/2001 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 9, 2001 and July 23, 2001. Court Reporter: Tia H. Lange. | 01-13994 | |
09/18/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: September 24, 2001. | 01-15735 | |
09/24/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-16088 | |
09/24/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-16090 | |
10/15/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-17380 | |
10/15/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 01-17381 | |
11/05/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA | 02-19020 | |
12/03/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-19223 | |
12/03/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/20/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2002. | 02-19223 |