judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY DANIEL MOORE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0276)
Case Number:S-08-0276Case Docketed On:12/23/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:TIMOTHY DANIEL MOORE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY DANIEL MOORE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy Daniel Moore Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 108
Citation:215 P.3d 271

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/23/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/14/2009Brief - Appellant and received copy of designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
01/27/2009Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal and proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding missing correspondence in record on appeal.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
02/03/2009Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to appellant with copy of requested correspondence in record at pages 382 and 383.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
02/10/2009Response/Objection - Motion to Dismiss AppealResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/24/2009Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
02/26/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/04/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
03/13/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/17/2009Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Nena James to act in this matter and recusing Justice Kite.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/19/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers and transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/23/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding status of case.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/23/2009Correspondence - Outgoing - responded to inquiry regarding status of case.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
09/02/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/18/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/18/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/22/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/21/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal