judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5887
B-5887
03/22/1976
Application for Writ of Error
GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION
BOB BULLOCK, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/13/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/20/1976Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/08/1976Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/26/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/01/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/13/1978Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
01/20/1977Response to Motion filed
01/13/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/31/1976Dissenting opinion issued.
12/31/1976Concurring Opinion issued.
12/31/1976Opinion issued
10/20/1976Response to Brief filed
10/08/1976Supplemental Brief filed
06/23/1976Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1976Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1976Reply to Response
04/01/1976Response to Petition
03/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/22/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATIONPetitioner
Bob Bullock, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information