judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. WEBER, ET AL V. GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC. ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1463
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. WEBER, ET AL V. GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC. ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9043-10Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Weber N
Jeffrey L. LightNY
AppellantAdam Ortberg N
Jeffrey L. LightNY
AppelleeGoldman Sachs Group, IncN
William D. NussbaumNY
AppelleeMichael Paese N
William D. NussbaumNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (RECEIVED ONLY)
11/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Weber)
11/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Ortberg)
11/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL (Emergency) and for a hearing on the Temporary Restraining Order
11/26/2010MISCELLANEOUS filing by Appelee identifying the parties in the matter below.
11/26/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AND Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Summary Reversal (Titled as: Appellee's Motion for Emergency Appeal . . . .)
11/30/2010TMC - appellants' motionS to proceed IFP - appellant's' EMERGENCY motion for summary reversal - appellee's opposition and motion to dismiss
11/30/2010 On consideration of the LODGED NOA filed November 24, 2010, from an order entered that same day granting a temporary restraining order, the motions filed by Michael Weber and Adam Ortberg to proceed IFP, appelant's lodged motion for summary reversal, the opposition thereto and mtoion to dismiss appeal and it appearing that a hearing is cheduled for December 10, 2010, it is ORDERED that the MOTIONS OF MICHAEL WEBER AND ADAM to PROCEED IFP ARE DENIED as neither is listed as a party on the NOA. It is *****MORE*****
11/30/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED and this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction... It is *****MORE*****
11/30/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED AS MOOT. (RDBRNW) (jl)
11/30/2010DISMISSED
12/22/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived