judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8244
A-8244
02/07/1961
Application for Writ of Error
T. D. ANDERSON, ET AL.
TALL TIMBERS CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/26/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/17/1961Reply to ResponseRespondent
05/15/1961Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/08/1961Post submission brief filedRespondent
05/02/1961Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/27/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
02/20/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/10/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/07/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/26/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/14/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
06/14/1961Opinion issued
05/17/1961Reply to Response
05/15/1961Response to Brief filed
05/11/1961Letter Filed
05/08/1961Post submission brief filed
05/02/1961Response to Brief filed
04/27/1961Brief on the Merits
03/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
02/20/1961Response to Petition
02/10/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/07/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/07/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. D. Anderson, et al.Petitioner
Tall Timbers CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information