judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8808
A-8808
02/12/1961
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
RICHARD H. GODEKE
CARL C. BLACK, SHERIFF OF MILAM COUNTY, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/04/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/14/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/14/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
02/12/1962Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
01/24/1962Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
01/16/1962Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
02/12/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/05/1962Order from Lower Court filed
04/06/1962Response to Motion filed
04/04/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/21/1962Opinion issued
02/14/1962Reply to Response
02/14/1962Response to Petition
02/12/1962Exhibits in case/cause filed
01/24/1962Exhibits in case/cause filed
01/20/1962Bond
01/16/1962Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedFiling granted
01/16/1962Document filed (see remarks)
01/16/1962Order from Lower Court filed
02/12/1961Brief in Support of Petition
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carl C. Black, Sheriff of Milam County, TexasRespondent
Richard H. GodekePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information