judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-5,196-02
WR-5,196-02
03/19/1976
1107-HC
CULLUM, HORACE GEORGE JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/1976MISC DOCUMENT RECD
04/23/1976MISC DOCUMENT RECD
04/13/1976MISC DOCUMENT RECD
03/31/1976ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
03/31/1976ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
03/19/1976WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/31/1976STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cullum, Horace GeorgeApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
141724-A