judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5898
B-5898
03/24/1976
MISC PETITION
O. P. CARRILLO
JUDICIAL QUALIFICATIONS COMMISSION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/13/1976Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/25/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
04/23/1976Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/14/1976Opinion issued
07/13/1976Supplemental Brief filed
07/12/1976Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
05/25/1976Response to Petition
05/06/1976Response to Motion filed
04/23/1976Petition for ___ filed
04/23/1976Brief on the Merits
04/12/1976Motion to dismiss
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Judicial Qualifications CommissionRespondent
O. P. CarrilloPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information