judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8297
A-8297
03/20/1961
Application for Writ of Error
PRITCHARD AND ABBOTT, ET AL., GALVESTON COUNTY, ET AL.
PATRICK H. MCKENNA, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/23/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/23/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/18/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/05/1961Letter brief Petitioner
07/05/1961Post submission brief filedPetitioner
06/30/1961Letter brief Respondent
06/23/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/03/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/17/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/13/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/12/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
03/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/23/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/18/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/03/1961Dissenting opinion issued.
10/03/1961Opinion issued
07/05/1961Letter brief
07/05/1961Post submission brief filed
06/30/1961Letter brief
06/23/1961Brief on the Merits
05/31/1961Document received (See Remarks)
05/31/1961Document received (See Remarks)
05/31/1961Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/03/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/17/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/13/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/12/1961Brief in Support of Petition
03/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/20/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Deaf Smith County, TexasAmicus Curiae
Dallam and Hartley Counties, TexasAmicus Curiae
Pritchard and Abbott, et al.Petitioner
Patrick H. McKenna, et al.Respondent
Southern Pine Lumber CompanyAmicus Curiae
Galveston County, et al.Petitioner
Angelina County Lumber CompanyAmicus Curiae
County Judges and Commissioners Association of TexasAmicus Curiae
Southland Paper Mills, Inc.Amicus Curiae
RUSK COUNTY, TEXASAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information