judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8779
A-8779
02/16/1961
MISC PETITION
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, WHELAN BROTHERS, D. F. WHELAN AND R. J. WHELAN, RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
DOROTHY N. MANZIEL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/12/1962Brief in Support of Petition
11/01/1962Motion for Rehearing
09/06/1962Response to Brief filed
07/13/1962Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
06/22/1962Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/15/1962Response to Brief filed
06/11/1962Supplemental Brief filed
04/18/1962Response to Brief filed
04/02/1962Brief on the Merits
02/16/1961Brief on the Merits
02/16/1961Brief on the Merits
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/15/1962Response to Motion filed
11/12/1962Brief in Support of Petition
11/02/1962Response to Motion filed
11/01/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/17/1962Opinion issued
09/06/1962Response to Brief filed
07/13/1962Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
06/22/1962Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/15/1962Response to Brief filed
06/11/1962Supplemental Brief filed
04/18/1962Response to Brief filed
04/02/1962Brief on the Merits
01/25/1962Letter Filed
01/05/1962Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1961Brief on the Merits
02/16/1961Brief on the Merits
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Appellant
Dorothy N. Manziel, et al.Appellee
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellant
John W. StaytonAmicus Curiae
Whelan Brothers, D. F. Whelan and R. J. WhelanAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information