judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8265
A-8265
02/27/1961
Application for Writ of Error
TRINITY ROAD AND BRIDGE COMPANY, INC.
J. C. WATSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/1961Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/06/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/21/1961Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/13/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/27/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/11/1961Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
04/10/1961Response to Motion filed
04/06/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/21/1961Supplemental Brief filed
03/13/1961Response to Petition
02/27/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/27/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. C. WatsonRespondent
Trinity Road and Bridge Company, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information