judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8273
A-8273
02/28/1961
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT CARGILL
S. T. BUIE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/20/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/19/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/14/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/28/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/20/1961Response to Motion filed
04/20/1961Brief in Support of Petition
04/19/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/14/1961Response to Petition
03/01/1961Letter Filed
02/28/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/28/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert CargillPetitioner
S. T. Buie, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information