judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8260
A-8260
02/20/1961
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
EMPACADORA DE CIUDAD JUAREZ, S. A.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/10/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/08/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
02/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/15/1961Response to Motion filed
05/10/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/08/1961Response to Petition
03/01/1961Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
02/20/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/20/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas and Pacific Railway CompanyPetitioner
Empacadora de Ciudad Juarez, S. A.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information