judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FAU VS. THE POWER COMPANY, INC.

Case Information: 38282
Short Caption:FAU VS. THE POWER COMPANY, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50267 , 50526
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A376484Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice BeckerPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/08/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/08/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/08/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13390
08/08/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/08/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to (1) pay the filing fee, (2) file and serve the docketing statement, and (3) file the case appeal statement in the district court clerk's office and file two certified copies of the case appeal statement with the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants.) 01-15293
09/19/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-15847
10/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 19, 2001, appellants filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. An appeal shall not be dismissed until the parties first "pay whatever fees are due." To date, appellants have failed to pay the filing fee. Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. We defer action on the notice of withdrawal, pending payment of the filing fee. 01-16885
01/03/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. To date, appellants have failed to pay the filing fee or otherwise respond to our October 9, 2001 order. Appellants shall pay the $200 filing fee within 10 days from the date of this order. Failure to pay the filing fee in a timely manner will result in the imposition of sanctions in the sum of $200.In the interest of judicial efficiency, we do not wish to delay the dismissal of this appeal any longer. We elect to treat appellants' notice of withdrawal as a motion for voluntary dismissal. We grant the motion and ' . . . dismiss this appeal.' NNP02-WM/MS/RR 02-00118
01/03/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.