judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DC APPLESEED CTR FOR LAW & JUST V. DEP'T OF INS. SEC & BANK

Case Information: 10-AA-1461
Short Caption:DC APPLESEED CTR FOR LAW & JUST V. DEP'T OF INS. SEC & BANKClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MIE007-09Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/09/2012
Expedited

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus CuriaeCouncilmember Mary M. ChehN
IntervenorGroup Hospitalization and Medical Services Inc.N
Dominic Perella NN
Craig A. Hoover NN
E. Desmond HoganYY
PetitionerD.C. Appleseed Center for Law and JusticeN
Marialuisa S. GallozziNY
Walter SmithYY
RespondentDepartment of Insurance Securities & BankingN
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
11/24/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
11/24/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
12/06/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE of Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc
12/07/2010APPEARANCE- of Dominic F. Perella on behalf of intervenor
12/07/2010APPEARANCE- of E. Desmond Hogan on behalf of intervenors
12/07/2010APPEARANCE- of Craig A. Hoover on behalf of intervenor
02/23/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION TO CONFIRM JURISDICTION LW
02/23/2011TMC - petitioner's misc motion to confirm jurisdiction
03/11/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ cd attached 8 black notebooks
03/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/22/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS DENIED and the parties shall address the issues of jurisdiction and standing in their birefs. It is *****MORE*****
03/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that this PFR IS HEREBY EXPEDITED. It is *****MORE*****
03/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX shall be filed APRIL 21, 2011, RESPONDENT and INTERVENOR'S shall be filed MAY 6, 2011, and the reply brief, if any, NO LATER THAN MAY 16, 2011...The parties shall hand serve their brief on all other parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be placed on the CALENDAR OF JUNE 2011... SEE HARDCOPY (RDKRTE) (rl)
03/22/2011LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING JUNE 2011 CALENDAR M. GALLOZZI T. KIM C. HOOVER
03/31/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING INTERVENOR
04/01/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Appellant).
04/21/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WAIVE APPENDIX (unopposed)
04/21/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF (with declaration and addendum pursuant to R. 28(h)Citations to Administrative Agency Orders, Decisions and Opinions)
04/29/2011AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF in support of Petitioner (Councilmember Mary Cheh)dwm
04/29/2011RECEIVED- brief of amicus curiae
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/06/2011MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF
05/06/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
05/16/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
06/01/2011On consideration of petitioner's consent motion to waive appendix filed by petitioner D.C. Appleseed Center, motion of Councilmember Mary M. Cheh for leave to file the lodged brief as amicus curiae in support of petitioner, and it appearing that this matter is scheduled on the Regular Calendar of June 9, 2011, it is ORDERED on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider thisk matter that the motion to waive appendix filed by petitioner D.C. appleseed Center is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of councilmemberr mary M. Cheh for leave to file the lodged brief as amicus curiae in support of petitioner is granted and the lodged brief is filed. (JAC)
06/01/2011AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF (Councilmember Mary M. Cheh)
06/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/07/2011LETTER from Clerk to parties regarding disqualification.
06/08/2011LETTER - signed by Todd Kim re: case on appeal/argument
06/08/2011RECEIVED responses to Clerk's letter from Marialuisa Gallozzi, Esquire, E. Desmond Hogan, Esquire, and Todd Kim, Esquire.
06/09/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/09/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Ruiz, Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby Walter A. Smith, Jr., Esq. for the PETITIONER E. Desmond Hogan, Esq. for the INTERVENOR
06/13/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to Supplement Response to New Contention made by Respondent-Intervenor GHMSI at Oral Argument.
06/14/2011LETTER from counsel for Respondent-Intervenor Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. (GHMSI) in response to the Clerk of the Court's ltr dated June 7, 2011 (E. Desmond Hogan)
06/24/2011On consideration of petitioner's motion to supplement response to new contention made by respondent-intervenor GHMSI at oral argument, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the Clerk is directed to file the supplement. (RZ,FI,B-R)
06/24/2011PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (Supplement)
06/27/2011RECEIVED- GHMSI's response to Appleseed's motion to supplement
09/13/2012FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Affirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the decision and other of the Department of Insurance, Securities, and Banking ("Department") is affirmed in part and reversed in part. The case is remanded to the Department for further proceedings not inconsistent with this opinion.)
10/09/2012FiledMandate
03/25/2019FiledArchived