judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ERIC L. JOHNSON v. LAURIE JEAN DAVIS-JOHNSON

Case Heading (S-08-0273)
Case Number:S-08-0273Case Docketed On:12/19/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ERIC L. JOHNSON v. LAURIE JEAN DAVIS-JOHNSON
Full Title:ERIC L. JOHNSON, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LAURIE JEAN DAVIS-JOHNSON, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEric L. JohnsonMitchell E. Osborn
AppelleeLaurie Jean Davis-JohnsonDaniel E. White
Rhonda Sigrist Woodard

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/19/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/03/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/25/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/31/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief of appellee; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/01/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/30/2009Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellant indicating that the matter has been settled and will be voluntarily dismissed. Appellee need not file a brief - the motion will be filed 5/5/09.EventPhone CallFinal
05/05/2009Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
05/05/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
05/12/2009Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant; requested that hard copies of motion be filed so case can be dismissedEventPhone CallFinal
05/18/2009Event - Phone Call - contacted Mr. Osborn and left mesage requesting the original and copies of motion to dismiss be delivered today.EventPhone CallFinal
05/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant (Plaintiff) Eric L. Johnson's motion to voluntary dismiss appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Eric L. Johnson's Motion to Voluntary Dismiss Appeal (Untimely, received ten days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/20/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/20/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal