judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8252
A-8252
02/16/1961
Application for Writ of Error
MODERN WHOLESALE FLORIST
BRANIFF INTERNATIONAL AIRWAYS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/14/1961Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/12/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
04/05/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/21/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
03/16/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/16/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/14/1961Motion for Rehearing
11/01/1961Opinion issued
10/18/1961Motion for Rehearing
10/03/1961Opinion issued
06/14/1961Response to Brief filed
06/12/1961Brief on the Merits
05/17/1961Document received (See Remarks)
04/06/1961Response to Motion filed
04/05/1961Motion for RehearingFiling granted
03/21/1961Response to Petition
03/16/1961Reply to Response
02/16/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/16/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Braniff International Airways, Inc.Respondent
Modern Wholesale FloristPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information