judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8299
A-8299
03/21/1961
Application for Writ of Error
STUART E. GILLESPIE
LAYLA CHURCH GILLESPIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/10/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/14/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/06/1961Response to Petition
04/06/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
03/24/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
03/21/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/12/1961Response to Motion filed
05/10/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/15/1961Letter Filed
04/14/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/06/1961Response to Petition
04/06/1961Response to Petition
03/24/1961Response to Petition
03/21/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/21/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stuart E. GillespiePetitioner
C. H. Gillespie, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Layla Church GillespieRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information