judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8281
A-8281
03/09/1961
Application for Writ of Error
TRINITY UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY
JACK L. SCOTT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/26/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/24/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/09/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
03/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/29/1961Response to Motion filed
05/26/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/24/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/09/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/29/1961Response to Petition
03/18/1961Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
03/09/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/09/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vinson, Elkins, Weens, Searls and Thomas B. WeatherlyAmicus Curiae
Jack L. ScottRespondent
Trinity Universal Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Strasburger, Price, Kelton, Miller and MartinAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information