Case: B-1304
B-1304
01/08/1969
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF WACO AND WACO I.S.D.
CONLEE SEED COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/23/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
04/18/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
03/27/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
01/17/1969 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/08/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/05/1969 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
08/04/1969 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
07/09/1969 | Opinion issued | | ||
04/23/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/18/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/18/1969 | Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
03/27/1969 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
02/19/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
01/17/1969 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/08/1969 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/08/1969 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Waco and Waco I.S.D. | Petitioner | |
Conlee Seed Company, Inc. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information