judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIMPTON (RANDOLPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38281
Short Caption:KIMPTON (RANDOLPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010971Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/07/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/07/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13337
08/07/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 6, 2001. Court Reporter: R. Walker. Filed in district court on: August 3, 2001. 01-13338
08/29/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 6, 2001. Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 01-14616
09/14/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: September 24, 2001. 01-15539
09/27/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16274
09/27/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-16279
10/01/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16487
11/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-18414
12/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19142
12/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 4, 2001. 01-19142