judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETER D. BROPHY, by his guardian and conservator, Kate Brophy, and KATE BROPHY, individually v. WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., A Nebraska corporation, and CHERYL R. NEAL

Case Heading (S-08-0272)
Case Number:S-08-0272Case Docketed On:12/18/2008
Linked To: S-08-0271
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:PETER D. BROPHY, by his guardian and conservator, Kate Brophy, and KATE BROPHY, individually v. WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., A Nebraska corporation, and CHERYL R. NEAL
Full Title:PETER D. BROPHY, by his guardian and conservator, Kate Brophy, and KATE BROPHY, individually, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC., A Nebraska corporation, and CHERYL R. NEAL, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeter D. BrophyL. Eric Lundgren
Gary J. Ceriani
Valeri S. Pappas
AppellantKate BrophyL. Eric Lundgren
Gary J. Ceriani
Valeri S. Pappas
AppelleeWerner Enterprises, Inc.Curtis B. Buchhammer
Patrick J. Murphy
Ryan Justin Schwartz
AppelleeCheryl R. NealCurtis B. Buchhammer
Patrick J. Murphy
Ryan Justin Schwartz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Trial - Damages, Trial - Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/18/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/18/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/26/2008Motion - OtherMotionOtherFinal
12/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission of attorneys pro hac vice; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2008Order - Pro hac vice - allow. Order granting admission of attorneys pro hac vice (Gary J. Ceriani and Valeri S. Pappas)OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/30/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed motion for two week extension of time to file opening brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Cross-appellants' opening brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/19/2009Service - Certificate of service (Amended)ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
02/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Cross-Appellants' amended certificate of service; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/07/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Answer Brief of Cross-Appellees Cheryl R. Neal and Werner Enterprises, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of cross-appellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/08/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I - IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Jury Instructions and Verdict; Volume VI - VII, Transcripts; Volume VIII, Exhibits). (Record filed four days late)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for Werner Enterprises, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gary Ceriani for appellees Brophy.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Curtis Buchhammer and Patrick Murphy, argument by Mr. Murphy for appellants in S-08-0271; L. Eric Lundgren, Gary J. Ceriani, and Valeri S. Pappas, argument by Mr. Ceriani for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/03/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/19/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/19/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/24/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal