judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEREMIAH M. GRAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1466
Short Caption:JEREMIAH M. GRAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-4556-10Filed Date:11/22/2010

Opening Event Date:11/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/13/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/15/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJeremiah Gray Y
James W. KleinNY
Shilpa S. SatoskarYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. Gidez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/28/2011RECORD INDEX
02/28/2011RECORD COPIES
02/28/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (order sealing bench conference Judge Keary filed 6/4/10; order Judge Keary filed 6/22/10) ***SEALED
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (241 pgs/Hamilton) 8/30/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (165 pgs/Jeon) 8/31/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (254 pgs/Hamilton) 9/1/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (386 pgs/Jeon) 9/2-3/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (175 pgs/Davis) 9/7/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (18 pgs/Maar) 9/8/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (33 pgs/Maar) 9/9/10 proc.
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (38 pgs/Wood) 11/18/10 proc. w/cd
03/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. (JAC)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on October 24, 2011.
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 1/23/12
01/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to April 17, 2012.
04/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/17/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/28/12
06/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/13/12
08/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/13/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/11/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
12/03/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/04/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/09/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
01/09/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/14/2013FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellant)Granted
01/14/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument
01/23/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/12/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/01/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/15/2013FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Thompson, Wagner, Shilpa S. Satoskar, Esq. for appellant John P. Gidez, Esq. for appellee
06/07/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
11/07/2013FiledReversed (OPINION) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Wagner, Senior Judge)
12/02/2013FiledMandate