judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EMPLOYERS NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. FRANCES WILLITS

Case: B-1315
B-1315
01/13/1969
Application for Writ of Error
EMPLOYERS NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
FRANCES WILLITS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/21/1969Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/17/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/20/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/25/1969Response to Motion filed
03/21/1969Brief in Support of Petition
03/17/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/20/1969Response to Petition
01/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/13/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frances WillitsRespondent
Employers National Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information