judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HALIM A. FLOWERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1455
Short Caption:HALIM A. FLOWERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL631-97Filed Date:11/22/2010

Opening Event Date:11/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/03/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHalim A. Flowers YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 22, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
12/23/2010RECORD INDEX
12/23/2010RECORD COPIES
12/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/07/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b) (By: ETW)
02/07/2011DISMISSED
03/03/2011MANDATE ISSUED